There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Madera Water Supply Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Madera Water Supply Enhancement Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Madera Water Supply Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Bureau of Reclamation to enter into a cooperative agreement with the Madera Irrigation District for purposes of supporting the Madera Water Supply Enhancement Project.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/16/2008Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 110-384.
10/22/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11805)
03/30/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/16/2008SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 816.
06/16/2008SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 110-384.
05/07/2008SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/28/2008SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
10/23/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
10/22/2007-3:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/22/2007-3:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11805)
10/22/2007-3:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1855.
10/22/2007-3:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11805-11806)
10/22/2007-3:48pmHouseMs. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/11/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/30/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/30/2007HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E728)
03/30/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/30/2007 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power04/11/2007 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/23/2007 Referred to
05/07/2008 Markup by
06/16/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-384
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/28/2008 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1855. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (06/16/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on October 22, 2007. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Madera Water Supply Enhancement Act - Declares that the Madera Water Supply Enhancement Project, California, is feasible and that no further studies or actions regarding feasibility are necessary.

Requires all planning, design, and construction of the Project to be undertaken in accordance with a cooperative agreement between the Secretary of the Interior and the Madera Irrigation District. Authorizes the Secretary to enter into a cooperative agreement for the support of Project design and construction. Limits: (1) the total cost of the Project for purposes of determining the federal share; and (2) the federal share of Project capital costs.

Considers capital, planning, design, permitting, construction, and land acquisition costs incurred by the District prior to this Act's enactment to be part of the nonfederal share. Requires the District to receive credit toward the nonfederal share for: (1) in-kind services that the Secretary determines would contribute substantially toward completion of the Project; (2) reasonable costs incurred from participation in the planning, design, permitting, and construction of the Project; and (3) the acquisition costs of lands used or acquired for the Project.

Prohibits the Secretary from providing funds for operation or maintenance. Makes Project operation, ownership, and maintenance the sole responsibility of the District. Directs the Secretary, before obligating funds, to work cooperatively with the District to use plans, designs, and engineering and environmental analyses that have already been prepared by the District. Authorizes appropriations. Terminates the Secretary's authority to carry out this Act 10 years after its enactment.