Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/17/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/01/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/01/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/10/2007