Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/24/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/21/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/12/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/12/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/27/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/27/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/11/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/04/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/02/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/10/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/25/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/25/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/25/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/30/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/08/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/08/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/08/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/13/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/13/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/13/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/15/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 12/13/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/18/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/23/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/07/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/07/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/14/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/26/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/04/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/11/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/08/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/15/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/15/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/06/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/20/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/20/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/18/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/22/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/25/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/02/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 10/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/20/2008