Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/09/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 01/23/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/23/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/03/2008