Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/14/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/04/2008