Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/24/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/25/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/26/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/01/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/19/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/03/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/22/2008