Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/17/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/18/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/19/2007