Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/19/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/21/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/02/2008