Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/25/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/25/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/25/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/25/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/25/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/25/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/26/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/26/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/01/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/03/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/17/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/05/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/05/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/18/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/19/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/19/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/24/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 08/02/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 08/02/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/03/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/03/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/03/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/04/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/17/2007
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/31/2008