Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/20/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/20/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/02/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/14/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/14/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/21/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/21/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/07/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/24/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/24/2007