Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/25/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/17/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/20/2007