Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/03/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/10/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/10/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/06/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/13/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/22/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/22/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/22/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/19/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/10/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/17/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/23/2008