Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/08/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/24/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/11/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/11/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/15/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/10/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/16/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/05/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/05/2008