Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/02/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/02/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/19/2007