Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 04/19/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/23/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/22/2008