Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/19/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/19/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/20/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/23/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/23/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/23/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/23/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/23/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/30/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/30/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/30/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/02/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/10/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/21/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/06/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/06/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/18/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/21/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/21/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/22/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/28/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/28/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/09/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew