Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/14/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/14/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 05/14/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/18/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/23/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/11/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/16/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/17/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/22/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/27/2008