Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/12/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/12/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/24/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/24/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/24/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/24/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/06/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/08/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/16/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/05/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/07/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/07/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/01/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/01/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/03/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/08/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/08/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/08/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/08/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/15/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/15/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/24/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/07/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/06/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/28/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/03/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/31/2008