Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/23/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/01/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/10/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/17/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/11/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/11/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/21/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/21/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/11/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/27/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/18/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/30/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/23/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/23/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/23/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/06/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/06/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/06/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/11/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/29/2008