Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/14/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/28/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/11/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 08/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/05/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/18/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/05/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/09/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/05/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/23/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew