Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/21/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/07/2007