Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/23/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/26/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/01/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/07/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/09/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/10/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/15/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/15/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/15/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/22/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/24/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/05/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/15/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/18/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/21/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/21/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/21/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/25/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/10/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/10/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/12/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/18/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/26/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/27/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/02/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/02/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 08/02/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/04/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/05/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/14/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/14/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/26/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/26/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/26/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/01/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/03/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/03/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/10/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/15/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 10/15/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/17/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/30/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/30/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/06/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/06/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/06/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/06/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/14/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/14/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/14/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/15/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/04/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/13/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/19/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/19/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/07/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/07/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/21/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/21/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/27/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/27/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/13/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/14/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/02/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/03/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/23/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/09/2008