Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 02/09/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/09/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/09/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/09/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/09/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/09/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/09/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/08/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/18/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/19/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/19/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/19/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/19/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/19/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/19/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/19/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/19/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/23/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/23/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/23/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/23/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/23/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/23/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/23/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/23/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/25/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/25/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/25/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/25/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/25/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/25/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/26/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/26/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/26/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/26/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/08/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/16/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/16/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/27/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/24/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/31/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/02/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/12/2007