Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/23/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/23/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/23/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/20/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/20/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/20/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/26/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/26/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/10/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/13/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/13/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/13/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/13/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/13/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/13/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/13/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/13/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/13/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/13/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/13/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/13/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/13/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/13/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/13/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/13/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/13/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/13/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/13/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/13/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/13/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/13/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/13/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/13/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/13/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/13/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/13/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/13/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/13/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/13/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/13/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/13/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/13/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/13/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/17/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/18/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/18/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/05/2007