Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/05/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/05/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/19/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2007