Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/25/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/13/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/13/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/18/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/18/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/26/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/24/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2008