Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/14/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/14/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/25/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/25/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/25/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/25/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/27/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/27/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/27/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/27/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/12/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/12/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/12/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/12/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/12/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/23/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/05/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/05/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/05/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/05/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/05/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/05/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/05/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/05/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/05/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/05/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/04/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/04/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/04/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/04/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/06/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/06/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/06/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/06/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/06/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/06/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/06/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/29/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008