There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Disabled Veterans Insurance Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 1922A of title 38, United States Code, to increase the amount of supplemental insurance available for totally disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/28/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/28/2008Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged.
04/30/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/25/2007Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/15/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/25/2007 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity04/30/2007 Referred to
05/28/2008 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs05/28/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2026. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/2007)

Disabled Veterans Insurance Act of 2007 - Increases from $20,000 to $40,000 the maximum amount of supplemental service disabled veterans' insurance for totally disabled veterans.