Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/26/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/26/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/01/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/08/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/10/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/10/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/22/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/11/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/18/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/31/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/06/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 12/17/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/08/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/23/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/23/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/23/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/29/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/05/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/05/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/05/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/14/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/03/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/11/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/09/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/31/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2008