Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/10/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 08/03/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/07/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/07/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/07/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/03/2008