Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/15/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/23/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/18/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/15/2008