Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/25/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/23/2008