Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/17/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/07/2008