Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/26/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/16/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/16/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/16/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/06/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/19/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/25/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/11/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/11/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/18/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/04/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/03/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/03/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/04/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/11/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/17/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/07/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/01/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/05/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/20/2008