Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/26/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/07/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/13/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/15/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/28/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/31/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/23/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/13/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/19/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/09/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew