Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/26/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/02/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/14/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/14/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/14/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/21/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/07/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/27/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/03/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/04/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/05/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/24/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/04/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/14/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/19/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/19/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 01/22/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/02/2008