Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/26/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/26/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/31/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 08/03/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/05/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/26/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/26/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/01/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/01/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/18/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/10/2008