Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/26/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/26/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/26/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/26/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/09/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/10/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/13/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/15/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/16/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/26/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/23/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/25/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/04/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/07/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/31/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/02/2008