Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/17/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/06/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/07/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/13/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/11/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew