There is one summary for H.R.2083. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/01/2007)

Amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to direct the Secretary of Energy to publish a final rule not later than December 31, 2010, determining whether to amend the standards in effect for refrigerators, refrigerator-freezers, and freezers manufactured on or after January 1, 2014.

Prescribes specified energy and water factors for: (1) residential clothes washers manufactured on or after January 1, 2011; and (2) dishwashers manufactured on or after January 1, 2010.

Requires dehumidifiers manufactured on or after October 1, 2012, to meet or exceed specified energy factor values.

Moves up from January 1, 2010, to January 1, 2009, the effective date for new qualifying levels for clothes washers the Secretary is required to establish.