Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/01/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/18/2007