Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/03/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/17/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/10/2007