Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/01/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/03/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/03/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/03/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/03/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/17/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/16/2007