Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/02/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/15/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/15/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/15/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/21/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/21/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/21/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/21/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/21/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/22/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/22/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/24/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/27/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/01/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 08/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/04/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/04/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/05/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/06/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/07/2007