Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/09/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/09/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/09/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/15/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/17/2008