Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/10/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/15/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/15/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/16/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/17/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/18/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/18/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/19/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/26/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/06/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/24/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/12/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008