Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/06/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/26/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/15/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/19/2007