Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/04/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/05/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/05/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/05/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/05/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/09/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/09/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/09/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/09/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/09/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 01/09/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/09/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/09/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/09/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/10/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/10/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 01/10/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/10/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/11/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/11/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/12/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/17/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/17/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/18/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/23/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/31/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/06/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 02/06/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/12/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/15/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/12/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/27/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/16/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/04/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/18/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/02/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/15/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/03/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/09/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/15/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/22/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/24/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/09/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/10/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/17/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/25/2008