Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/15/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/13/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/13/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/13/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/13/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/19/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/19/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/17/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/24/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/24/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/04/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/29/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/29/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/04/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/04/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/04/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/31/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/05/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/09/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 08/01/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 08/01/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 08/01/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/10/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew