Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/08/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/08/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/15/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/18/2007